Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Reid, Andre, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Al-Amin, Karima, against Central Refrigerated Service Inc, represented by Schultz, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Bessen, Diane E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2005 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE IS NOW CLOSED | |
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
August 28, 2007 | Docket Event | SETTLE AS PER CALENDAR CLERK | |
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
June 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event | READY JURY | |
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.