Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Georgia, filed a(n) Dui case against Owen, Jennifer Nicole, represented by Richman, Andrew J, in the jurisdiction of Forsyth County, GA, . Forsyth County, GA Superior Courts with McClelland, T. Russell, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcClelland, T. Russell, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryDui |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationForsyth County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arraignment - Bond
Judge: McClelland, T. Russell, III |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Date Notice | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Bond Sheet | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Accusation | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance Hearing Order | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Magistrate Form | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation - Court Appearance Required | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
DUI Review Hearing
Judge: McClelland, T. Russell, III |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Under Investigation Notice | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Consolidated Motions and Discovery Package |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.