Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anderson, Raymond G, Jr, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Williams, Breyuna L, against Axson, Jellisa Renee, represented by Johnson, Andrea M, in the jurisdiction of Forsyth County, GA, . Forsyth County, GA Superior Courts with Bagley, Jeffrey S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBagley, Jeffrey S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryPaternity / Legitimation |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationForsyth County, GA |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Bagley, Jeffrey S. |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Bagley, Jeffrey S. |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Rule Nisi | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Rule Nisi | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Motion | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Motion | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Consent Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.