Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Funding Llc ,, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nadler , James Alan, against Good , Jeff, represented by Pro Se ,, in the jurisdiction of Fayette County, GA, . Fayette County, GA Superior Courts with JASON B THOMPSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJASON B THOMPSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFayette County, GA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeNt Diswop |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | 2 RETURNED MAILINGS ADDRESSED TO DEFENDANT | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | PER PEREMPTORY CALENDAR | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | EFILED DOCUMENT:FINALDISPOSITIONFORM | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | EFILED DISMISSAL | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEF | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED DOCUMENT: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT W/ATTACHMENTS | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED DOCUMENT:INITIATIONFORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.