Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anderson Jessica Renee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hawk Jon R Sr, against Bitco General Insurance Company, Zane Grace Construction, Inc., Cody Reginald, represented by Smith J Holder Jr, Willis Jeremy W, in the jurisdiction of Dougherty County, GA, . Dougherty County, GA Superior Courts with JOHN M. STEPHENSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryAutomobile Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDougherty County, GA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE PRINTED
Date: January 24, 2022CALENDAR
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE PRINTED
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: February 06, 2022NOTICE
Date: January 28, 2022CERTIFICATE
Date: December 29, 2021LETTER
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE PRINTED
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE PRINTED
Date: November 29, 2021CERTIFICATE
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00NOTICE PRINTED
Date: November 29, 2021CERTIFICATE
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00NOTICE PRINTED
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00CALENDAR
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00CERTIFICATE
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00DEMAND
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00DEMAND
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00DEMAND
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00SUMMONS AND PROCESS
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00SHERIFF SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00SHERIFF SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00SUMMONS SHERIFF DEPARTMENT
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00SHERIFF SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00CIVIL CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00SUMMONS AND PROCESS
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00SHERIFFS ENTRY OF SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00REQ FOR ADM
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00REQ FOR ADM
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00REQ FOR ADM
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.