Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David Smith Autoland Inc, Friendly Finance Corp, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Butler Jeffery M, against Marine Corps Logistics Base, Harris Sheila Renee, in the jurisdiction of Dougherty County, GA, . Dougherty County, GA Superior Courts with JOHN M. STEPHENSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2016 |
CategoryPost Judgment Garnish/Attach/ Other Relief |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDougherty County, GA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
DISPOSITION
Date: May 15, 2019DISMISSAL
Date: May 15, 2019CALENDAR
Date: July 31, 2017NOTICE PRINTED
Date: July 31, 2017CALENDAR
Date: March 26, 2019NOTICE PRINTED
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00CALENDAR
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00BANKRUPTCY
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00BANKRUPTCY
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00SERVICE
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00SERVICE
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00SHERIFF SERVICE
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.