Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Aigp 13Ten, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Cohen, Benjamin J, against And All Other Occupants, Barber, Tramaine, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts Magistrate with Anderson, Berryl A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2024 |
CategoryMagistrate Dispossessory - Non Payment Of Rent |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseMagistrate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Attorney
Judge: McNeal, Shannon |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Answer | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Leave of Absence | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Warrant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.