Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bert, Daniel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Reese, Kelly I, against Silas, Yahkahnan, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Morris, Shondeana C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMorris, Shondeana C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic - Divorce/Alimony |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a filing for divorce and other relief in the Superior Court of Dekalb County, Georgia. The petitioner, Daniel Bert, states that they have been a resident of Georgia for more than six months and that the respondent, Yahkahnan Silas, ...
23FM2138 Bert v Silas Amended
Date: February 14, 2024Case Disposition Bert v Silas
Date: February 13, 202423FM2138 Bert v Silas Final Order Signed
Date: February 13, 202423FM2138 Bert v Silas signed
Date: February 07, 20242024.02.02 - Conflict Ltr KIR - Week of Feb 12 2024
Date: February 02, 20242024.1.17 - LOA (KIR) Bert
Date: January 17, 20242023.02.13-KIR LOA
Date: February 13, 20232023.02.13-Complaint for Divorce
Date: February 13, 20232023.02.13-Summons
Date: February 13, 20232023.02.13-Case Initiation Form
Date: February 13, 20232023.02.13-Standing Order
Date: February 13, 20232023.03.11-KIR LOA
Date: March 11, 20232023.03.16-Affidavit of Service
Date: March 16, 20232023.07.29 - KIR LOA
Date: July 29, 20232023.09.12 - KIR LOA
Date: September 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Final Judgment and Decree | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | 23FM2138 Bert v Silas Amended | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment and Decree Order Final Judgment and Decree |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Disposition Form | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Disposition Bert v Silas | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 23FM2138 Bert v Silas Final Order Signed | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Domestic Relations Non-Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Zoom Hearing | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 23FM2138 Bert v Silas signed | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Conflict |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.