Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Camden Development, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brooks, Douglas L, against Mccluney, Dedrick, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Jacobs, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Peremptory
Judge: Jacobs, Mike |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule Nisi Issued | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Service | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | State Civil Service | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Out for Service | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | General Civil Information Form | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.