Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Presidential Commons Ii, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Michelle R, against Rooster 14 Cookie Company Llc, represented by Downs, William W, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Anderson, Berryl A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderson, Berryl A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryMagistrate Garnishment - Regular |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Anderson, Berryl A |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Trust Disbursement | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | To Judge | |
October 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent Agreement | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Garnishment Answer | |
October 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
October 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Motion | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | To Judge | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Garnishment Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.