Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hill, Chelsea, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Boyd, Joanna G, Graham, Jessica, against Parks, Clinardus Jerrod, represented by Fuller, Sandra M, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Adams, Gregory A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdams, Gregory A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic - Divorce/Alimony |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Withdrawal
Date: March 15, 2022Motion for Contempt (complete)
Date: March 22, 2022CNJ 21FM8527
Date: March 24, 2022Attorney Withdrawal
Date: April 05, 2022Motion to Withdraw
Date: April 05, 2022Order Allowing Withdrawal of Counsel
Date: April 05, 2022Signed Arrest Order on Motion for Contempt
Date: May 12, 2022EOA
Date: September 26, 2022Leave of absence 2022
Date: September 26, 2022COS for EOA and LOA
Date: September 26, 2022COS for AMR third party request
Date: September 27, 2022Motion for Contempt w COS
Date: October 11, 2022Entry of Appearance
Date: October 21, 2022LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: October 21, 2022Parks Withdrawal
Date: February 02, 2023CNJ 21FM8527
Date: February 10, 2023Conflict for week of March 13th
Date: March 06, 2023Hill Worksheet
Date: March 22, 2023Hill Dispo
Date: March 22, 2023Hill Addendum
Date: March 22, 2023Hill Decree
Date: March 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hill Worksheet | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hill Dispo | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hill Addendum | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hill Decree | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Child Support Addendum | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Child Support Worksheet | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Disposition Form | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment and Decree | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Non-Jury
Judge: Adams, Gregory A. |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Conflict for week of March 13th |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.