Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Riley, Timothy, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Holmes, John, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Scott, Sabrina presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2021 |
CategoryMagistrate Dispossessory - Non Payment Of Rent |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Anderson, Berryl A |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Zoom Hearing Information | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ called back from Marshal | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ To Marshal | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Service | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Late Answer | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Application Issued | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ application sent to judge | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.