Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Washington Mutual Bank, filed a(n) Magistrate General Civil case represented by Henry, Dennis E, against Eisler, Linda, represented by Debarr-Johnson, Althea, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMagistrate General Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Payment | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Unknown Converted Event | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Settlement | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | To Judge | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | To Judge | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Consent Order | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Anderson, Berryl A |
|
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Check to Inactive |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.