Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chimney Trace Apts, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Passino, David R, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryState Dispossessory - Non Payment Of Rent |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Tenant Vacated | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Payment | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury
Judge: Anderson, Berryl A |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Consent Order | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Service by Tack and Mail | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Out for Service | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Payment | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Filling Fee DDF1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.