Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Department Of Human Services, Ga Dept Of Human Resources, Hoke, Quontavious, Jr., filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Comins, Randy, against Hoke, Quantavious D, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Scott, Mark Anthony presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryRecovery Of Child Support (Dhs) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Incarceration Order | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Contempt Order | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Service - Notorious | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Contempt | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice to Produce | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Contempt Order | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Service - Notorious | |
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Rule Nisi Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.