Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ga Dept Of Human Resources, Slaughter, Michael David, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Horton, Ladonya, against Slaughter, David M, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Flake, Gail C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryRecovery Of Child Support (Dhs) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Child Support Worksheet | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment on Pleadings for Plaintiff | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Final Order | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Flake, Gail C. |
|
August 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Order - for Continuance | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Sheriff/Marshall Entry of Service | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Child Support Worksheet | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice to Produce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.