Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Milner Document Products, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kreimer, Stanley E, Jr., against Area Inc, represented by Millikan, Troy R, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Jacobs, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
CategoryContract / Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Settlement | |
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event | Disp/Dispute Resolution Program | |
August 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Peremptory
Judge: Jacobs, Mike |
|
June 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury
Judge: Jacobs, Mike |
|
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Returned from Post Office | |
May 14, 2004 | Docket Event | Order of Referral to Dispute Resolution | |
May 14, 2004 | Docket Event | Jury Demand | |
February 10, 2004 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 10, 2004 | Docket Event | Answer to request for admissions | |
January 14, 2004 | Docket Event | Service Notorious |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.