Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pioneer Financial Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bridgers, Daniel Franklin, against Stroud, Victor, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Panos, Johnny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
CategoryContract / Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Payment | |
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Fifa Issued | |
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event | To Judge | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Returned from Post Office | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Check to Inactive | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Peremptory
Judge: Panos, Johnny |
|
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event | Check to Inactive |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.