Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shumpbert Edward Charles, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Shumpbert Edward Charles -Pro Se, against Yeager Mike, Smith Al, represented by Yeager Mike -Pro Se, Cobb Larry G, Smith Al -Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Coweta County, GA, . Coweta County, GA Superior Courts with DUSTIN W. HIGHTOWER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2017 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCoweta County, GA |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
CHANGE OF ADDRESS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS / CERT OF SVC / COBB COA |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DSP |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY RECUSAL - DB ORD |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /CERT OF SVC MOT |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
THEORIES DEFENDANT'S THEORY OF RECOVERY / CERT OF SVC THE |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS / CERT OF SVC STA |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MEMO |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY / COBB RUC |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FOR LEAVE OF ABSENCE -SEE NOTICE FOR DATES / CERT OF SVC // COBB NLA |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF DEFENDANT'S AL SMITH, COWETA COUNTY BOARD CHAIRMAN, AND SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, MIKE YEAGER, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT / CERT OF SVC ANS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.