Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Georgia filed a(n) case against Mayner Jazmine Biaunca, represented by Golshan Azadeh, Brown Shawanda, in the jurisdiction of Coweta County, GA, . Coweta County, GA Superior Courts with W. TRAVIS SAKRISON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCoweta County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TERMINATION OF PROBATION // JHC ORD |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER MODIFICATION OF PROBATION, CONVERTING FINE OF $2,252.00 BE CONVERTED AT A RATE OF $60.00 PER DAY TO 37 DAYS (296 HOURS) OF COMMUNITY SERVICE AT A LOCATION APPROVED BY THE SUPERVISING OHIO PROBATION OFFICER ORD |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION NEG GUILTY PLEA TO LIO: SIMPLE ASSAULT DSP |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
SENTENCE 12 MTHS PROB, $1500F, $100 CC, $150 ATTY FEES SEN |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
SENTENCE 12 MTHS PROB SEN |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION NEG GUILTY PLEA TO LIO: STALKING (MISD) DSP |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONCEALED WEAPON PERMIT NOTICE CWP |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLEA PROCEEDING RECORD NON NEG BLIND PLEA PLE |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
RECORDED IN COURT BY: KIMBERLY GREENE REC |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONFLICT LETTER AMENDED CONFLICT LETTER//JAN 25, 2016//SHAWANDA BROWN CON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.