Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Georgia filed a(n) case against Collins Bobby Lee, represented by Pittman Jerry F., in the jurisdiction of Coweta County, GA, . Coweta County, GA Superior Courts with WILLIAM F. LEE, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCoweta County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
FAX REQUESTING COPY OF SENTENCE FAX |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS HELD APRIL 9, 2012 BEFORE THE HON. JUDGE WILLIAM F. LEE, JR. TRA |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
RECORDED IN COURT BY: DOROTHY SHUTT REC |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SENTENCE 3 YRS PROBATION SEN |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
CONDITIONS OF PROBATION COP |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
PLEA PROCEEDING RECORD PLE |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION NGP DSP |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT LIFTED/VACATED BWR |
|
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR PRODUCTION FOR PRISONER FOR 4/9/12 ORD |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR CAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.