Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Georgia filed a(n) case against Taylor Randall Lawrence, represented by Samper Ricardo G, in the jurisdiction of Coweta County, GA, . Coweta County, GA Superior Courts with WILLIAM F. LEE, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCoweta County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS HELD APRIL 9, 2012 BEFORE THE HON. JUDGE WILLIAM F. LEE, JR. TRA |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SENTENCE 5 YRS PROBATION/FINE $500 - CC $100 - ATTY FEE $100 SEN |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION NGP DSP |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
CONDITIONS OF PROBATION COP |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
RECORDED IN COURT BY: DOROTHY SHUTT REC |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
PLEA PROCEEDING RECORD PLE |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY FEE RESTITUTION ORDER ARO |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CER |
|
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR CAL |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PRINTED PARTY NOTICE PRINTED COURT EVENT: ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 14th day of March, 2012 JUDGE: WILLIAM F LEE JR & L. JACK KIRBY NTC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.