Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Georgia filed a(n) case against Baker Leah Jones, represented by Pittman Jerry F., in the jurisdiction of Coweta County, GA, . Coweta County, GA Superior Courts with WILLIAM F. LEE, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCoweta County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AFF |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION NEG GP LIO (M) DSP |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
SENTENCE 12M PROB CC SEN |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
SENTENCE 12M PROB/F$500/CC$100 SEN |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
PLEA PROCEEDING RECORD/ LIO (M) PLE |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
CONDITIONS OF PROBATION COP |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CER |
|
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR CAL |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PRINTED BONDSMAN & ATTORNEY NOTICES PRINTED COURT EVENT: ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 14th day of March, 2012 JUDGE: WILLIAM F LEE JR & L. JACK KIRBY NTC |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PRINTED PARTY NOTICE PRINTED COURT EVENT: ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 14th day of March, 2012 JUDGE: WILLIAM F LEE JR & L. JACK KIRBY NTC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.