Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citibank Na ,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lavrar Esq., Flynn, against Youngblood , Ben, in the jurisdiction of Cherokee County, GA, . Cherokee County, GA Superior Courts with MICHELLE HOMIER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryContract/Account |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCherokee County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNt Defjud |
FIFA RECORDED & MAILED TO ATTY
Date: November 09, 2021REQUEST FOR FIFA
Date: November 08, 2021DISPOSITION
Date: October 21, 2021DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2021CERTIFICATION & REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2021NOTORIOUS SVC 7/6/21 ON BEN YOUNGBLOOD BY LEAVING A COPY WITH BRANDI LOWE, GF
Date: July 07, 2021SUMMONS
Date: June 04, 2021GENERAL INFORMATION FORM
Date: June 04, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.