Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
World Omni Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Block, Stephen H, against White, Octavia, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Sapp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Property Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service - Perfected PERSONAL: OCTAVIA WHITE **RECEIVED FOR FILING IN STATE COURT ON 12/11/2015** |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing RULE NISI VACATED BY COURT Judge: Sapp, Gregory |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Foreclosure $50.00 RECEIPT#:118384 BY: DLSCOTT |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order - Turnover 2015 TOYOTA CAMRY VIN 4T1BF1FK9FU002008 |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Disposition Entered REASON: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order COURT HEREBY GRANTS PLTFS WORLD OMNI MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS COURT ALSO GRANTS WRIT OF POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF WORLD OMNI AND AGAINST WHITE WITH RESPECT TO THE 2015 TOYOTA CAMRY COURT FURTHER VACATES RULE NISI |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rule Nisi ORDERED THAT DEF SHOW CAUSE ON NOV 30 2015 AT 9:30 AM |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
ADR Status Report UNABLE TO SCHEDULE DEF DID NOT RESP TO MEDIATION ORDER NOR TO CORRESPONDENCE FROM MEDIATION CENTER |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - For Judgment on Pleadings NOTICE MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Alternative Dispute Resolution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.