Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Gregory V. Sapp presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissed - With Prejudice BY PLTF |
|
November 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Disposition Entered REASON: DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
ADR Status Report MEDIATED ATTY/PARTY WILL FILE |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Order - Alternative Dispute Resolution | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: RETIRING JUDGE PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS {GI} |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate - Of Filing DEFS AMENDED NOTICE T TAKE DEPOSITION TO PLTF |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MOTION VERBALLY WITHDRAWN Judge: Ginsberg, Ronald |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate - Of Filing PLTFS RESP TO DEFS 1ST INTERROGS AND 1ST REQ FOR PROD OF DOCS |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion - For Sanctions MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLTF FOR FAILURE AND REFUSAL TO ANSWER DEFS INTERROGS AND REQ FOR PROD OF DOCS |
|
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certificate - Of Filing DEFS NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.