Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Soto, Diana I, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Balbo, Attilio J., against Soto, Angel, Jr., represented by O'Connell, Tracy Ann, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with J, 5 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryContempt - Child Support |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Contempt Hearing
Judge: Freesemann, Penny Haas |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit & Witness List | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Notice of Filing - Witness Subpoena (Elisia Baker) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Motion for Continuance | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - For Continuance w/ Certificate of Service |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - Response to Motion for Continuance |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate - Of Service Response to Motion for Continuance |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed Defendant s Verified Answer to Plaintiff s Motion for Contempt and Motion to Shorten Response Time |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit - Of Service Service Perfected - Angel Soto, Jr. July 7, 2021 |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons page1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.