Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gary, Crystal, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Milton, Alexis, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Walmsley, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalmsley, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2022 |
CategoryStalking Protective Order |
Last RefreshedJuly 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Entry Of Service Personal Service for Alexis Milton on 6/6/2022 |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil General | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Stalking Twelve Month Protective Order |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Sent to Sheriff - TPO or Stalking | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Sent to Sheriff - TPO or Stalking | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - For Continuance Order for Continuance of Hearing and Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Stalking Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil General | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Entry Of Service Personal Svc Alexis Milton May 12, 2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.