Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
T&J Properties Of Savannah, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Williams, Stephanie, Williams, Sarina, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Barker, Michael H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarker, Michael H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2016 |
CategoryDispossessory/Distress Warrant |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Eviction Sent To Sheriff | |
November 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Financial Payment $25.00 RECEIPT#:226827 {EVICTION FEE} PAID BY: NCOURT |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Eviction Requested-Pd $25.00 | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Hearing ANS FILED BY BOTH DEFTS Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed REASON: WRIT OF POSS-HRG $1,751.00 + CC |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: INITIAL ASSIGN (PREVIOUS UNASSIGNED) PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS {ZZ} |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed STEPHANIE WILLIAMS SARINA WILLIAMS |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Tacked And Mailed BOTH/DEPUTY M HARDAWAY/788 |
|
October 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Financial Payment $74.50 RECEIPT#:225771 {DISPOSSESSORY E-FILING} PAID BY: NCOURT |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Suit Amount: $1,376.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.