Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Barker, Michael H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Garnishment - Or Registry Disbursed $399.00 CHECK#: 69782 RECEIPT#: 194585 PAID TO: HOWARD, YOLANDA |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Financial Payment $399.00 RECEIPT#:194585 {CIVIL RESTITUTION} PAID BY: MCDANIEL/BRADSHAW |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed REASON: JUDG FOR PLTF-TRIAL $200.00 + CC |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing ANS FILED BY BOTH DEFTS Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: DOCKET ASSIGNED PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS NOT ASSIGNED |
|
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order - Court Ordered Mediation COPIES MAILED TO PARTIES COPIES TO MEDIATION/ADR |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed RONALD BRADSHAW |
|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed GILBERT MCDANIEL |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Personal Service RONALD BRANDSHAW/DEP. E. BARGERON |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Residential Service TO DEBERA MCDANIELS FOR GILBERT MCDANIELS/DEP. E. BARGERON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.