Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Khalidi Properties, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Hunley, Martin, Goss, Stephen L, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Barker, Michael H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarker, Michael H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDispossessory/Distress Warrant |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Hearing ANS FILED BY STEPHEN GOSS/NO PER JURIS OVER MARTIN HUNLEY Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed REASON: WRIT DENIED |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: DOCKET ASSIGNED PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS NOT ASSIGNED |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed STEPHEN GOSS |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Tacked And Mailed BOTH - DEP GRIMALDI |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Financial Payment $74.00 RECEIPT#:179707 {DISPOSSESSORIES} PAID BY: KHALIDI PROPERTIES LLC |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Filed | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Suit Amount: $1,200.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.