Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Robertello, Joan, filed a(n) Damage Suit case represented by Durham, E. Blake, against The Mayor And Alderman Of The City Of Sa, Evangelical Lutheran Church Of The Ascen, represented by Stillwell, Brooks, Iii, Herman, Jennifer N., Mackenzie, Malcolm, Vaught, Ashlee, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Moss, Mary Kathryn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2013 |
CategoryDamage Suit |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed REASON: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Moss, Mary Kathryn |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request - For Continuance FAX FROM PLTF: SETTLEMENT PENDING |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Request - For Continuance Granted | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: DOCKET ASSIGNED PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS NOT ASSIGNED |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order - Court Ordered Mediation COPIES TO PARTIES COPIES TO MEDIATION/ADR |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed THE MAYOR AND ALDERMEN OF THE CITY OF SAVANNAH |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Personal Service THE MAYOR ALDERMAN/CLAYTON |
|
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note CASE RESENT TO THE SHERIFF'S DEPT TO DEP CLAYTON FOR SERVICE ON THE 2ND DEF: MAYOR EDNA JACKSON |
|
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed EVANGELICAL LUTHERAN CHURCH OF THE ASCENSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.