Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Perry, Martinez Sinclair, filed a(n) Damage Suit case against Williams, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Barker, Michael H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryDamage Suit |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note ORDERS MAILED TO PARTIES |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed REASON: JUDG FOR DEFENDANT-HRG |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended - Complaint | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: DOCKET ASSIGNED PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS NOT ASSIGNED |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note CASE RETURNED FROM MEDIATION MARKED MEDIATED WITH NO AGREEMENT. CASE TO BE SCHEDULED FOR COURT |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note LETTER REC'D FROM PLTF REQUESTING CASE TO RESCINDED FROM MEDIATION |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note MEDIATED AGREEMENT AND CONSENT ORDER FILED IN BY MEDIATION CENTER |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note AS PER JUDGE MOSS, BEFORE CASE CAN BE SET DOWN FOR TRIAL, MEDIATION CENTER HAS TO RETURN CASE TO MAG CT. CASE IS IN ANDREAS MISC FILE HOLD TRAY |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note MEDIATED AGREEMENT AND CONSENT ORDER AND A LETTER FROM PLTF ADDRESSED TO MEDIATION REQUESTING CASE TO BE RETURNED TO MAGISTRATE COURT FOR TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.