Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Engraving & Graphics Arts, Inc, filed a(n) General Civil Other case against Incite, Exhibits, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Barker, Michael H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2008 |
CategoryGeneral Civil Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed REASON: JUDG BY COURT-DEFAULT $1,380.00 + CC |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Damage Hearing
Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note FAXED LETTER REC'D FROM PLTF REQUESTING A DEFAULT HEARINIG |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: DOCKET ASSIGNED PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS NOT ASSIGNED |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Personal Service M. BURKE/J. PHILLIPS |
|
October 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Financial Payment $72.00 RECEIPT#:88557 {E-FILING SUIT} PAID BY: NCOURT |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint - Filed | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Suit Amount: $1,380.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.