Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chatham Loan Co, filed a(n) General Civil Other case against Clark, James, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Barker, Michael H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryGeneral Civil Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed REASON: JUDG FOR PLTF-TRIAL $720.00 + CC |
|
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: DOCKET ASSIGNED PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS NOT ASSIGNED |
|
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed JAMES CLARK |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Personal Service J.CLARK/SGT. TILLMAN |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Financial Payment $72.00 RECEIPT#:83072 {SUITS W/ SERVICE} PAID BY: CHATHAM LOAN COMPANY |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint - Filed | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Suit Amount: $720.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.