Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chatham City Apartments, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Gray, Laquita, Washington, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Moss, Mary Kathryn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2008 |
CategoryDispossessory/Distress Warrant |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Financial Payment $25.00 RECEIPT#:84185 {EVICTION FEE} PAID BY: BYCK PROPERTIES LP |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed REASON: WRIT OF POSS-HRG $505.00 + CC |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Hearing
Judge: Moss, Mary Kathryn |
|
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judge Change Or Assign REASON: DOCKET ASSIGNED PREVIOUS JUDGE WAS NOT ASSIGNED |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed A. WASHINGTON /L. GRAY |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Tacked And Mailed FOR BOTH DEP ECKLIN |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Financial Payment $71.50 RECEIPT#:82772 {DISPOSSESSORIES} PAID BY: CHATHAM CITY APTS. |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Suit Amount: $505.00 |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.