Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcroberts, Joseph Martin, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Boyles, Major, Wilcher, Sheriff John, represented by Pretorius, Andre, Puhala, Emily Catherine, Hart, R. Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Abbot, Louisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAbbot, Louisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - For Continuance | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Habeas Corpus Hearing
Judge: Abbot, Louisa |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Proposed Pretrial Pretrial/Prehearing Order - Non-Domestic |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter - Pro Se Letter Received And Clerks Response | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certification - Under Rule 3.2 Unsigned |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case - Filing Form | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Proposed |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended - Complaint Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.