Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Okinus Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Johnson, Therease, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2021 |
CategoryContinuing Garnishment |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Traverse Hearing
Judge: Macke, Tracie Grove |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Traverse - Denied | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note Case is being moved to a virtual hearing. Both pltf and deft notified. |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Garnishment - Answer No payment sent in with answer form |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Garnishment - Answer No $ |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request - For Continuance | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent for Virtual Hearing | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Traverse |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Traverse - Filed | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Garnishment - Check $262.34 Receipt MAG-2021-017791 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.