Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Babb Roger A. filed a(n) case against Cunningham Amanda Lynn, represented by Morgan Daniel D, in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA, . Catoosa County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2016 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Filing LocationCatoosa County, GA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ||
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ARREST WARRANT W16-1329,1330,1331 | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DSP | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | SEN | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ACC | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | AGP | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
W16-1329, W16-1330, W16-1331, W16-1332 WA |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | AND ENTRY INTO RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY - DANIEL MORGAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.