Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cunningham Jessica filed a(n) case against Vandergriff Tracy Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA, . Catoosa County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Filing LocationCatoosa County, GA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DSP | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SEN | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | AGP | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MACC | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
W21-342 WA |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
W21-341 OR BOND WA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.