Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dyer Lauren F filed a(n) case against Walker Dennis Wayne, represented by Aaaa Bonding Company, in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA, . Catoosa County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Filing LocationCatoosa County, GA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
PARTY NOTICE PRINTED COURT EVENT: MISDEMEANOR CALENDAR CALL COURT DATE: the 3rd day of December, 2018 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
BONDSMAN & ATTORNEY NOTICES PRINTED ON TUESDAY, OCTOBER 30, 2018 COURT EVENT: MISDEMEANOR CALENDAR CALL COURT DATE: the 3rd day of December, 2018 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | CAL | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
BONDSMAN & ATTORNEY NOTICES PRINTED ON WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 10, 2018 COURT EVENT: MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 18th day of October, 2018 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
PARTY NOTICE PRINTED COURT EVENT: MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 18th day of October, 2018 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | CAL | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | MACC | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION# E02862949 THRU E02862952 CIT |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.