Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brock James Roger filed a(n) case against Boyd Nicholas Keith, in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA, . Catoosa County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2018 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Filing LocationCatoosa County, GA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | AND PROBATION WARRANT | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | DSP | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | SEN | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AND PROBATION WARRANT | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | AGP | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | SEN | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | MACC | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | DSP | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
W18-376 WA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.