Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edirisinghe, Ayanka, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bongiovi, Henry J, against Astera Care Llc, represented by Dinkin, Jeffrey A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Brown, James W presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Employment (15) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Sanctions
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.