Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cortez, Ron, filed a(n) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) case against City Of Goleta, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Government Exemption | |
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order, Filed | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney, Filed | |
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.