Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Real Time Staffing Services Inc, Koosharem Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hogan, Bruce W, against Clearpoint Business Resources Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Collections (09) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
September 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service, Filed | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
August 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
August 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.