Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryBartow Superior |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBartow County, GA |
|
DISPOSITION INFORMATION FORM - DISPO GA707955
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00JMT GA707955 (SS)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00GARN AFF GA707955
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS - OBJ MTN OPEN AND MODIFY DJ GA707955
Date: May 10, 2021GARN COS GA707955
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00SUMMONS SHERIFF DEPARTMENT - Summons for PLEASANT GRVE MISSIONARY BPTST CHURCH CARTERSVILLE.
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00APP 4 FUNDS GA707955
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00AFF GA707955
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00COS GA707955
Date: May 03, 2021Case Information Form
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00COS GA707955
Date: May 10, 2021SHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE - CORPORATION
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00NOH SIGNED BY SS; CONTINUED
Date: May 26, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.