Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2018 |
CategoryBartow Superior |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBartow County, GA |
|
Proposed Order to Extend Discovery
Date: December 03, 2019SETTLED, SATISFIED, DISMISSED
Date: February 20, 2020Rule 5.2 NOD to Pltff.
Date: January 07, 2020Mermelstein Conflict Letter
Date: January 27, 2020Dismissal
Date: February 20, 2020DISPOSITION INFORMATION FORM - Case Disposition Form
Date: February 20, 2020Proposed Order to Extend Discovery
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY (SS)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00RULE 52 CERTIFICATE - RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00RULE 52 CERTIFICATE - RULE 5.2 CERTIIFICATE
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Consent Motion to Extend Discovery Through March 4, 2020
Date: December 03, 2019RULE 52 CERTIFICATE - Certificate Of Service Of Discovery
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00COMPLAINT/ SUMMONS /DFI
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY; SENT TO SCOTT SMITH
Date: July 31, 2019CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY; SENT TO SCOTT SMITH
Date: July 31, 2019Consent Order
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00RULE 52 CERTIFICATE
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS - Designation of Email for Electronic Service
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Leave of Absence
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.