Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2017 |
CategoryBartow Superior |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBartow County, GA |
|
Added from PeachCourt: 10/4/2017 1:23:33 PM Complaint
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Added from PeachCourt: 2/1/2018 3:13:33 PM Certificate of Serving Discovery
Date: February 01, 2018Added from PeachCourt: 12/6/2017 4:25:28 PM Affidavit of Service on Donna Price
Date: December 06, 2017Added from PeachCourt: 12/28/2017 3:55:19 PM Certificate of Serving Discovery
Date: December 28, 2017Added from PeachCourt: 12/28/2017 3:55:18 PM Demand for Jury of Twelve
Date: December 28, 2017SUMMONS SHERIFF DEPARTMENT - Added from PeachCourt: 10/4/2017 1:23:33 PM Summons for Price, Donna M..
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Added from PeachCourt: 12/4/2017 10:59:40 AM Leave of Absence
Date: December 04, 2017Added from PeachCourt: 12/28/2017 3:55:18 PM Answer of Defendant
Date: December 28, 2017Added from PeachCourt: 10/4/2017 1:23:34 PM General Civil Case Filing Information Form
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.