Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2013 |
CategoryBartow Superior |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBartow County, GA |
|
MOTION TO WITHDRAW (HOWELL)
Date: April 29, 2013PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY
Date: May 13, 2013FOR CHANGE OF CUSTY/CHILDSUPPORT
Date: April 17, 2013PROCESS SERVER
Date: February 22, 2013TO PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF CUSTODY/SHILDSUPPORT/CONTEMPT FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Date: March 19, 2013OF SERVICE
Date: February 25, 2013COMPLAINT/SUMMONS/EXHIBITS
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00MOTION FOR APPT PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.