Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prowest Pcm Inc, Pinner Construction Co Inc, Anderson Burton Construction Inc, Venegas, Jose, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kinnaird, R Stephen, against Brito, Jose, Victor, Greg, Pinner Construction Company Inc, Magnuson, Tom, Pro West Constructors, (total of 10) See All represented by Emerson, James D, Bonetati, Marilyn L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Brown, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management121 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions596 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time633 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal, Filed | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion: Summary Adjudication
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.